TN SB1554 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the POST commission to study and make recommendations on how vehicle drivers and passengers should behave when stopped by a police officer; requires the department of safety to include the recommendations in the driver license manual and on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the POST commission to study and make recommendations on how vehicle drivers and passengers should behave when stopped by a police officer; requires the department of safety to include the recommendations in the driver license manual and on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-12-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1573 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback