TN SB1553 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, removes prohibition on persons convicted of malfeasance or misfeasance in office, felonies, or crimes involving moral turpitude from being an employee of the city for ten years after the conviction; reduces, from a 2/3 majority to a simple majority, the required vote by the council for approving and removing mayoral appointments; authorizes the city board to appoint and promote city employees. - Amends Chapter 486 of the Private Acts of 1941; as amended and rewritten.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Chapter 486 of the Private Acts of 1941; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 26 of the Private Acts of 2013; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Charter of the City of Smithville.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Comp. became Pr. Ch. 22
2023-04-13SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2023-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Local Calendar for 4/13/2023
2023-03-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
2023-03-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-20SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1565 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 22

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback