TN SB1553 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the CSM Bobby G. Davis and BG Carl E. Levi National Guard Armory as the BG Carl E. Levi and CSM Bobby G. Davis National Guard Armory. - Amends Chapter 358 of the Public Acts of 2019.
Title
As enacted, renames the CSM Bobby G. Davis and BG Carl E. Levi National Guard Armory as the BG Carl E. Levi and CSM Bobby G. Davis National Guard Armory. - Amends Chapter 358 of the Public Acts of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1579 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 669