TN SB1552 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Pub. Ch. 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates "The Volunteer State" as the official nickname of this state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, designates "The Volunteer State" as the official nickname of this state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28 Pub. Ch. 516
2020-02-28 Effective date(s) 02/21/2020
2020-02-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-02-19SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-02-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-02-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-02-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-02-10HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-02-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-02-10HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-02-03SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-01-30SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/3/2020
2020-01-30SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/30/2020
2020-01-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-01-22SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/28/2020
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-11-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1562 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 516

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback