TN SB1550 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, imposes a $25.00 litigation tax on each case filed in circuit, general sessions, and juvenile courts in the county to fund the Scott County Family Justice Center. - Amends Chapter 247 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Title
Subject to local approval, imposes a $25.00 litigation tax on each case filed in circuit, general sessions, and juvenile courts in the county to fund the Scott County Family Justice Center. - Amends Chapter 247 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 35 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on next calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Consent Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1542 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-06 - Pr. Ch. 35