TN SB1549 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, clarifies that all parks and recreation areas owned or operated by the county are under the control of the board of park commissioners. - Amends Chapter 296 of the Private Acts of 1957; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, clarifies that all parks and recreation areas owned or operated by the county are under the control of the board of park commissioners. - Amends Chapter 296 of the Private Acts of 1957; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 21 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 21