TN SB1548 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes proceeds from the hotel motel tax to be used for expenditures incurred in connection with a sports facility and the promotion of tourism. - Amends amend Chapter 131 of the Private Acts of 1969; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes proceeds from the hotel motel tax to be used for expenditures incurred in connection with a sports facility and the promotion of tourism. - Amends amend Chapter 131 of the Private Acts of 1969; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 30 | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1538 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 30