TN SB1533 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the county highway engineer position from elected to appointed and changes the county highway engineer's duties to only be the duties as provided in Tennessee County Uniform Highway Law. - Amends amend Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 2018.
Title
Subject to local approval, changes the county highway engineer position from elected to appointed and changes the county highway engineer's duties to only be the duties as provided in Tennessee County Uniform Highway Law. - Amends amend Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 16 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1526 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 16