TN SB1531 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities for two years to June 30, 2020; requires the department to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2017 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities for two years to June 30, 2020; requires the department to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2017 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1034 | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1625 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1034