TN SB1528 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, deletes antiquated provisions related to poll taxes; codifies current practice of city regarding election timing and terms; adds grounds for removal from office for board of mayor and aldermen; authorizes the hiring of a city recorder; removes cap on fines that may be imposed for a violation of ordinances, on property tax, and business tax. - Amends Chapter 507 of the Private Acts of 1949; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, deletes antiquated provisions related to poll taxes; codifies current practice of city regarding election timing and terms; adds grounds for removal from office for board of mayor and aldermen; authorizes the hiring of a city recorder; removes cap on fines that may be imposed for a violation of ordinances, on property tax, and business tax. - Amends Chapter 507 of the Private Acts of 1949; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1521 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pr. Ch. 14