TN SB1523 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a ticket vendor from charging additional fees for the sale of a ticket that exceed 15 percent of the face value of the ticket; requires a ticket vendor to disclose the face value of the ticket, the cost of additional mandatory fees, the cost of additional fees charged by the ticket vendor, and the total cost of the ticket, to the consumer; specifies that a violation constitutes an unfair or deceptive act or practice, subject to penalties and remedies under the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act of 1977. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67, relative to ticket sales.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1434 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback