TN SB1517 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state to issue and sell bonds of up to $124 million.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state to issue and sell bonds of up to $124 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 403 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1509 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 403