TN SB1514 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires public higher education institutions in this state to adopt a policy to allow American sign language courses to satisfy any foreign language requirements for admission to an undergraduate degree program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, requires public higher education institutions in this state to adopt a policy to allow American sign language courses to satisfy any foreign language requirements for admission to an undergraduate degree program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Pub. Ch. 546 | |
2018-03-13 | Effective date(s) 03/09/2018 | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0681) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0592) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1533 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 546