TN SB1513 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the regional library for the blind and physically handicapped to the regional library for accessible books and media; updates antiquated language regarding persons with disabilities within statutory provisions relative to the state library system. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, renames the regional library for the blind and physically handicapped to the regional library for accessible books and media; updates antiquated language regarding persons with disabilities within statutory provisions relative to the state library system. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 543 | |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1702 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 543