TN SB1510 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of child sexual abuse be provided as part of a family life curriculum; provides immunity from a cause of action for such instruction provided by teachers employed by the LEA and certain other instructors in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-603 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of child sexual abuse be provided as part of a family life curriculum; provides immunity from a cause of action for such instruction provided by teachers employed by the LEA and certain other instructors in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 37-1-603 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Pub. Ch. 609
2018-04-04 Effective date(s) 04/02/2018
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-21SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-19HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0871)
2018-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-15SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 2
2018-03-15SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0591)
2018-03-15SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0679)
2018-03-15SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0661)
2018-03-15SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0751)
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
2018-03-13SenateSenate Reset on calendar 3/15/18
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-05SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2018
2018-03-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/5/2018
2018-02-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-26SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-26SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-22SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
2018-01-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2164 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 609

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1510&ga=110
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB1510.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/110/pub/pc0609.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/SA0591.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/SA0661.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/SA0679.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/SA0751.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/SB1510.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM1782.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2159.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2432.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2529.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1510&ga=110

Bill Comments

feedback