TN SB1502 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the time period in which insurance premiums deducted from the salaries of participating employees to be deposited into the county insurance fund is three calendar days rather than three business days. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the time period in which insurance premiums deducted from the salaries of participating employees to be deposited into the county insurance fund is three calendar days rather than three business days. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1366 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Failed in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee