TN SB1500 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes any county official providing remote electronic access to certain public records of the office that are maintained on computer storage media in that office to submit electronically the statement that must be sent to the comptroller 30 days prior to providing such access. - Amends TCA Title 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, relative to public records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1485 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.