TN SB1500 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to appropriations and local approval, adds Houston and Stewart counties to the West Tennessee River basin authority; clarifies the jurisdiction within which the authority may exercise its powers and duties. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 11.
Title
As introduced, subject to appropriations and local approval, adds Houston and Stewart counties to the West Tennessee River basin authority; clarifies the jurisdiction within which the authority may exercise its powers and duties. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee