TN SB1500 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes from workers' compensation injuries that occur during recreational activities, are not required by the employer, and do not directly benefit the employer. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-110.
Title
As introduced, excludes from workers' compensation injuries that occur during recreational activities, are not required by the employer, and do not directly benefit the employer. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-110.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1500&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1500.pdf |