TN SB1497 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane, except for passing and other purposes, to interstates and multilane divided highways with two or more lanes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the "Slow Poke Law," which prohibits the operation of vehicles in the left lane, except for passing and other purposes, to interstates and multilane divided highways with two or more lanes. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0618 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback