TN SB1495 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing the use of tanning devices by minors. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 117, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing the use of tanning devices by minors. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 117, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Pub. Ch. 608
2018-04-04 Effective date(s) 04/02/2018
2018-04-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-03-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-03-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-03-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-03-12SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0692)
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
2018-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-05HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 4, PNV 2
2018-03-05HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0692)
2018-03-05HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0691)
2018-03-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0
2018-03-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0588)
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-26SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
2018-01-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1489 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 608

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback