TN SB1493 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes disabled veterans with quadriplegia to possess and use liquid extract cannabis if certain criteria met and documentation maintained. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to cannabis for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/13/2022 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0666 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Committee