TN SB1492 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires persons who withdraw 10,000 or more gallons of water per day without registering with the commissioner of environment and conservation, in order to respond to an emergency, to report such withdrawals to the director of the water resources division within 90 days of the withdrawal. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 69.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 65 and Title 69, relative to water resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-18SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-18SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1136 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback