TN SB1490 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee`
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee`
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 12, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 12, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee` |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee