TN SB1489 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes military and memorial plates to be personalized; requires payment of a fee to defray the costs of designing and manufacturing the personalized plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes military and memorial plates to be personalized; requires payment of a fee to defray the costs of designing and manufacturing the personalized plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0076 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 461

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback