TN SB1486 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court to issue an order of expunction after a person completes the sentence imposed for any misdemeanor or Class C, D, or E felony that was nonviolent and was not a sexual offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to expunction of certain offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1438 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee