TN SB1480 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires an officer to provide an alleged victim of certain criminal offenses with a document notifying the victim of the global positioning monitoring system used as a condition of bail. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4, relative to criminal procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 969
2024-04-24SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2024
2024-04-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-04-15SenateRe-refer to S. Cal Comm
2024-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024
2024-04-09SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2024
2024-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024
2024-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2024-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024
2024-04-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024
2024-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024
2023-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-06SenateSponsor change.
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0689 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback