TN SB1474 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the clerks of the circuit, chancery, general sessions, and special courts to audio record all court proceedings in civil matters; imposes a fee for a party to obtain a copy of the relevant portion of the audio recording. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18 and Title 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the clerks of the circuit, chancery, general sessions, and special courts to audio record all court proceedings in civil matters; imposes a fee for a party to obtain a copy of the relevant portion of the audio recording. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18 and Title 21.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1133 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback