TN SB1471 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires information that LEAs must annually report to the department of education on the isolation or restraint of students receiving special education to be posted on the department's web site so that the information is readily available to the public. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires information that LEAs must annually report to the department of education on the isolation or restraint of students receiving special education to be posted on the department's web site so that the information is readily available to the public. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2235 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1471&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1471.pdf |