TN SB1471 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes alternative provisions for creation and governance of regional transportation authorities. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes alternative provisions for creation and governance of regional transportation authorities. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-17 Pub. Ch. 362
2009-06-17 Effective date(s) 06/05/09
2009-06-05 Signed by Governor.
2009-05-27 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2009-05-27 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-05-26 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-05-21 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2009-05-20 Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
2009-05-20 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0262)
2009-05-20 Subst. for comp. HB.
2009-05-20 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2009-05-18 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2009-05-18 Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0
2009-05-18 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0366)
2009-05-14 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/18/2009
2009-05-12 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-05-07 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009
2009-04-28 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2009-04-23 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009
2009-04-21 Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/28/2009
2009-04-16 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009
2009-04-14 Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/21/2009
2009-04-09 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009
2009-04-07 Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/14/2009
2009-04-02 Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-12 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1263 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback