TN SB1463 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that compensation for members of the national guard must accrue upon them being ordered to active state service and the payment of compensation to members must use this state's established weekly pay cycle as needed to effectuate compensation. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 1, relative to military pay.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360 | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0562 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023