TN SB1463 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that 10 years' experience as a wildlife officer may be substituted for the requirement of a bachelor's degree for a person to qualify for the position of wildlife officer with the wildlife resources agency. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, specifies that 10 years' experience as a wildlife officer may be substituted for the requirement of a bachelor's degree for a person to qualify for the position of wildlife officer with the wildlife resources agency. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-25 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084 | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/1/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 1/25/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1084