TN SB1462 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Criminal Forfeiture Process Act"; replaces civil forfeiture with criminal forfeiture process for property seized for forfeiture in connection with criminal offenses. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 39; Title 40; Title 47; Title 53; Title 55; Title 57; Title 67; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 12; Title 39; Title 40; Title 47; Title 53; Title 55; Title 57; Title 67; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to forfeiture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1285 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee