TN SB1459 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, repeals tax levy on property located in unincorporated areas of county, the proceeds of which are used for road purposes, as part of a reallocation of funds to be appropriated for such purposes. - Amends Chapter 373 of the Private Acts of 1937; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, repeals tax levy on property located in unincorporated areas of county, the proceeds of which are used for road purposes, as part of a reallocation of funds to be appropriated for such purposes. - Amends Chapter 373 of the Private Acts of 1937; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 19 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 19