TN SB1457 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that, in regard to a charitable organization's limitation of tort liability, providing shelter from adverse weather includes, but is not limited to, allowing persons to enter the premises for purposes of temporary shelter from severe storms. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 34.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 34, relative to tort liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 140
2023-03-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-16SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/16/2023
2023-03-13SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1080 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/06/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback