TN SB1453 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the period of time, from five years to one year from the date of issuance, in which a process, warrant, precept, or summons for a misdemeanor offense must be served, returned, or quashed before it is automatically terminated and removed from the records. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 6, relative to criminal procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1084 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee