TN SB1452 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the sentence a person who commits first degree murder as a minor is required to serve before becoming release eligible from 51 years to 30 years; applies to offenses committed on or after July 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to sentencing for offenses committed by minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1089 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback