TN SB1451 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, enacts the Tipton County Budget and Fiscal Procedure Act of 2017.
Title
Subject to local approval, enacts the Tipton County Budget and Fiscal Procedure Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 24 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1444 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pr. Ch. 24