TN SB1448 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Portland to levy a privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Portland to levy a privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 436 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1438 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 436