TN SB1444 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a written request for a hospital to provide a more detailed statement of services received and expenses incurred by a patient must be received by the hospital within one year of the patient's discharge in order for the hospital to be required to respond. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that a written request for a hospital to provide a more detailed statement of services received and expenses incurred by a patient must be received by the hospital within one year of the patient's discharge in order for the hospital to be required to respond. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0720 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee