TN SB1437 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an employee of the department of correction to meet with an incarcerated individual within one year of the individual's release eligibility date to create a release plan. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5, relative to release on parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 381 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0344) |
2021-04-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0323) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0545 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381