TN SB1436 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 15 days to 30 days the period of time during which an HMO or a representative of an HMO may request a hearing in response to a cease and desist order from the commissioner of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from 15 days to 30 days the period of time during which an HMO or a representative of an HMO may request a hearing in response to a cease and desist order from the commissioner of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0065 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback