TN SB1434 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer who conducts a search of a motor vehicle to report in person to a judge of the general sessions court within three days and provide certain statistical information; requires the clerk of the general sessions court to report the information to the administrative office of the courts; requires the administrative office of the courts to provide an annual report to the chairs of the appropriate committees of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 38 and Title 40, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 18, Chapter 4, Part 2; Title 38 and Title 40, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0600 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.