TN SB1430 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of financial institutions to publish on the department's website its annual report summarizing the department's accomplishments under the Tennessee BIDCO Act in promoting economic development in this state. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of financial institutions to publish on the department's website its annual report summarizing the department's accomplishments under the Tennessee BIDCO Act in promoting economic development in this state. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0523 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.