TN SB1428 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-04-17SenateRecalled from Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1280 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback