TN SB1426 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows retailers to deduct bad debt written off by a lender from a private label credit card account on the retailer's sales tax return under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-507.
Title
As introduced, allows retailers to deduct bad debt written off by a lender from a private label credit card account on the retailer's sales tax return under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-507.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Approved by Delayed Bills Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0674 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee