TN SB1417 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, provides that all actions, arbitrations, or other binding dispute resolution proceedings to recover damages for a deficiency in the design, planning, supervision, observation of construction, or construction of a trolley or light rail system, for injury to property, real or personal, arising out of any such deficiency, or for injury to the person or for wrongful death arising out of any such deficiency, must be brought against any governmental entity that owns, operates, or controls the trolley or light right system within four years after substantial completion of an improvement. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 20, relative to governmental tort liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 506
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0310)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-21HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2021-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0322)
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0798 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 506

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback