TN SB1413 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes an obsolete statutory provision regarding the date and time frame in which the commissioner of transportation was to begin promulgating and enforcing rules to implement the Outdoor Advertising Control Act of 2020. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17 and Title 54, Chapter 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, Chapter 17 and Title 54, Chapter 21, relative to outdoor advertising.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-03-08SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/15/2023
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/8/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-01SenateSponsor change.
2023-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1353 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback