TN SB1410 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of commerce and insurance to cooperate fully with the department of health in all aspects of the transfer of the board of pharmacy and the long term effects of such transfer including prompt submission of any requested documents or records. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31; Title 56, Chapter 57; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 32 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of commerce and insurance to cooperate fully with the department of health in all aspects of the transfer of the board of pharmacy and the long term effects of such transfer including prompt submission of any requested documents or records. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31; Title 56, Chapter 57; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 32 and Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1900 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of HHR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1410&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1410.pdf |