TN SB1409 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of economic and community development to post on its website at least quarterly the number of jobs actually created by a project funded by FastTrack funds within three years of the project receiving the funds. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 9; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 9; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to grants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0901 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback